IL HB3359 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Forcible Entry and Detainer Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Changes references to forcible entry and detainer actions and actions for possession to references to eviction actions. Changes references to orders of possession and judgment of possession to references to eviction orders. Makes corresponding changes to the Counties Code; the Illinois Municipal Code; the Illinois Service Member Civil Relief Act; the Environmental Protection Act; the Clerks of Courts Act; the Code of Civil Procedure; the Controlled Substance and Cannabis Nuisance Act; the Condominium Property Act; the Landlord and Tenant Act; the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Rights Act; and the Safe Homes Act.
Title
FORCIBLE ENTRY ACTION-EVICTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0173 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-001 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-037-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |