IL HB3358 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that each member of the General Assembly shall, on an annual basis, participate in a law enforcement educational program, which shall include, but shall not be limited to, a ride-along program and a simulation training program, as organized by a county sheriff's department of that member's legislative district or representative district.
Title
GA-LAW ENFORCEMENT TRAINING
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Tipsword [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Patrick Sheehan [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3358&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3358.htm |