IL HB3343 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision authorizing an active policeman to establish credit for certain prior law enforcement service, provides that the requirement that the policeman applies for the credit within 2 years after beginning employment does not apply to an active policeman who becomes a member of the Fund on or after December 1, 2019, makes an application for the credit in writing prior to December 31, 2023, and pays to the Fund, within 5 years after the date of application, a specified amount. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHI POLICE-PRIOR SERVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 5-214.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3343&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3343.htm |