IL HB3340 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a Healthy Local Food Incentives Program to double the purchasing power of Illinois residents with limited access to fresh fruits and vegetables. Creates the Healthy Local Food Incentives Fund as a special fund in the State treasury for the purpose of implementing the Program. Provides that subject to appropriations, the Department shall make an annual grant of $1,000,000 from the Fund to a qualified Illinois non-profit organization or agency, which shall be distributed to participating Illinois farmers markets for the purpose of providing matching dollar incentives (up to a specified amount) for the dollar value of SNAP or WIC benefits spent on SNAP or WIC eligible food products at participating Illinois farmers markets and producer-to-consumer venues. Provides that the qualified non-profit organization shall have a demonstrated track record of (i) building a statewide network; (ii) designing and implementing successful healthy food incentive programs that connect SNAP recipients with local producers; (iii) implementing funds distribution and reporting processes; and other requirements. Provides that at least 60% of the monies deposited into the Fund shall be distributed to participating Illinois farmers markets for healthy local food incentives and program implementation; and that a maximum of 40% of the monies deposited into the Fund shall be used for statewide program development and other purposes. Requires the non-profit organization or agency to submit a progress report to the Department with certain information, including the impact of the Program on increasing the quantity of fresh fruits and vegetables consumed by SNAP and WIC families, as determined by customer surveys.
Title
HEALTHY LOCAL FOOD INCENTIVES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.866 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3340&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3340.htm |