IL HB3329 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Employment Security Law and the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that the Department of Employment Security may not use a person's social security number in the Department's correspondence. Requires the Department to develop a system of identifying information to be used instead of social security numbers.
Title
SSN IN CORRESPONDENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-12 | Senate | To Unemployment Insurance |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1005 | 1005-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 405 | 1900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |