IL HB3321 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that it is a violation of the Act for a person registered or required to be registered under the Act to accept or agree to accept compensation from a State agency, regardless of whether or not that compensation would be for the purpose of lobbying legislative action.
Title
LOBBYING-AGENCY COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 170 | 11.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3321&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3321.htm |