IL HB3317 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Domestic Violence Task Force Act. Creates the Domestic Violence Task Force to establish a consistent, uniform statewide system to protect victims and survivors of domestic violence, while holding offenders accountable. Contains requirements and responsibilities of the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall be composed of specified members. Provides that the Family Violence Coordinating Council within the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall provide administrative support to the Task Force. Repeals the Act on September 1, 2027. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
2021-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David A. Welter
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-28HouseArrived in House
2021-05-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rezin
2021-05-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000
2021-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-001
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-05-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2021-05-10SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2021-04-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2021-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3317&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3317sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB3317_04162021_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200HB3317_05272021_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB3317sam001_05302021_025000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback