IL HB3315 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if a committed person dies while incarcerated in a Department of Corrections institution or facility, the chief administrative officer of the Department institution or facility shall order that an autopsy of the committed person be conducted by a physician contracted by the Department or shall request that the county coroner or medical examiner of the county in which the institution or facility is located conduct the autopsy. Provides that the results of the autopsy shall be made publicly available and shall be posted on the Department's website.
Title
CD CORR-PRISONER DEATH-AUTOPSY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3315&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3315.htm |