IL HB3295 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Design-Build Procurement Act. Provides that for purposes of the Act, "State construction agency" means a construction agency as defined under the Illinois Procurement Code (currently, "State construction agency" means the Capital Development Board). Changes references concerning the Capital Development Board to State construction agency for purposes of requirements under the Act. Modifies provisions concerning the selection committee to remove specified requirements for the committee. Provides for an annual report (currently, at the end of each 6-month period) following the awarding of a contract to selected design-build entities with specified contents. Repeals a Section concerning the repeal date of the Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DESIGN BUILD-PROCUREMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | To Agency Operation Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 537 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 537 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 537 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 537 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 537 | 90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3295&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3295.htm |