IL HB3288 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that the program established under the introduced bill shall be developed in collaboration with: (1) employer associations representing manufacturers; (2) secondary and postsecondary institutions, including public universities and community colleges; and (3) workforce stakeholders, including local workforce innovation boards and local workforce innovation areas.
Title
DCEO-REGIONAL MANUFACTURING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |