IL HB3283 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Minority and Female Business Enterprise Council.
Title
FINANCE-TECHNICAL
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 8.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |