IL HB3282 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Data Processing Services for Financial Institutions Act. Changes the definition of "financial institution" to remove a depository institution and include a bank, savings bank, credit union, or a foreign banking corporation that receives certificates of authority from the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation (rather than the Office of Banks and Real Estate). Provides that if a financial institution makes data available to an independent data processing servicer, the data shall remain the property of the financial institution. Effective immediately.
Title
DATA PROCESSING-OWNERSHIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0170 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 715 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 715 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |