IL HB3276 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Creates the Tamms Minimum Security Unit Task Force. Provides for membership on the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall study the subject of a practical, efficient, and beneficial repurposing of the Tamms Minimum Security Unit and its property for the benefit of the public, including the possibility of providing mental health services, health services, public safety, law enforcement training purposes, fire services, medical training and any other option for repurposing that the Task Force deems appropriate. Provides that each member of the Task Force shall serve without compensation. Provides that the Task Force shall meet 2 times per year or at the call of the Chairperson. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall provide administrative support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2023 with its recommendations and is dissolved on January 1, 2024. Repeals these provisions on January 1, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-TAMMS REPURPOSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |