IL HB3274 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Requires the Department on Aging, the Department of Human Services, and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to identify all programs operating in the State, both public and private, that provide services to meet the unique needs and circumstances of senior citizens. Requires the Department on Aging to compile and maintain a list of the identified programs that includes for each program listed: (i) a brief description of program services; (ii) eligibility requirements; and (ii) instructions on how to apply to the program. Requires the Department on Aging and the Departments of Human Services and Healthcare and Family Services to post the list of identified programs on their websites in a relevant and conspicuous place. Requires the Department on Aging to ensure that printed copies of the list of identified programs are available for distribution to senior citizens at each local agency that contracts with a designated area agency on aging. Requires the Secretary of State to ensure that printed copies of the list of identified programs are available for distribution to senior citizens at each driver services facility operated by the Secretary of State.
Title
AGING-SENIOR SERVICES LISTING
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |