IL HB3270 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act and the State Finance Act. Requires the Department of Veterans' Affairs to establish and administer the Illinois Homeless Veterans Program to provide grants and per diems to facilities providing shelter and assistance to homeless persons who served as members of the Armed Forces of the United States, the Illinois National Guard, or any reserve component of the Armed Forces of the United States, and who were discharged under conditions other than dishonorable. Provides that the primary components of the program shall include advocacy for homeless veterans and increasing public awareness on the issue of homelessness among veterans and its root causes. Requires the Department to solicit federal and State funding, donations, and grants for the purpose of implementing the program. Creates the Illinois Homeless Veterans Program Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury for the purpose of implementing the program. Establishes the Homeless Veterans Service Coordinating Committee to discuss and research ways in which the veterans services provided by public and private agencies can be made more easily available and better focused to serve homeless veterans. Effective immediately.
Title
IL HOMELESS VETERANS PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | Remains in Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.786 | New Code | See Bill Text |