IL HB3269 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Alternative Fuels Act. Provides that the Secretary of State may collect user fees for vehicles of the Second Division registered under plate category C. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a dealer may use a special plate issued to the dealer to transport a vehicle sold to a customer either by towing or by driving the sold vehicle with the special plate attached to the vehicle. Provides that the Secretary may limit the number of special plates authorized that are issued to dealers, manufacturers, or transporters based on factors including, but not limited to, sales of vehicles, revenue, or number of employees. Adds background check and education requirements for applicants for a remittance agent license. Adds requirements for licensure of a new vehicle dealer or a used vehicle dealer. Defines "Buy Here, Pay Here used vehicle dealer" and creates licensure requirements for a Buy Here, Pay Here used vehicle dealer. Provides that the Secretary may create special dealership licenses for entities that specialize in specific types of used motor vehicles that may be based on model, make, age, or other factors that the Secretary deems appropriate. Provides that any owner who is not a manufacturer of the vehicle and chooses to lease a used vehicle for a period of less than 12 months shall ensure that the lessee maintains valid registration and liability insurance and shall not collect any fees in connection with the registration of the vehicle unless the owner is also a licensed remittance agent.
Title
SOS-DEALER LICENSING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0505 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 120 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-904.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-904.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 5-401.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-403.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |