IL HB3257 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Professional Counselor Examining and Disciplinary Board.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-31 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-03-19 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |