IL HB3250 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Limitation on Public Service Act. Provides that an elected official may not hold more than one public office simultaneously. Specifies that the limitation applies regardless of whether the elected official receives compensation for a public office. Defines "elected official" and "public office". Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTED OFFICIALS-LIMITATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |