IL HB3244 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that counties may impose a tax to be used exclusively for school facility purposes, school resources officers, or mental health professionals (rather than exclusively for school facility purposes). Adds referendum language to levy, reduce, or discontinue the tax. Amends the Innovation Development and Economy Act and the School Construction Law to make conforming changes. Amends the School Code to make conforming changes and to provide that if a school district having a population of less than 500,000 inhabitants determines that it is necessary for school security purposes and the related protection and safety of pupils and school staff to hire a school resource officer, the district may levy a tax or issue bonds as provided under a provision in the Code authorizing a school board to levy a tax or to borrow money and issue bonds for fire prevention, safety, energy conservation, accessibility, school security, and specified repair purposes if funds are not needed for those other purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL FACILITY & RESOURCE TAX
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-001 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 230 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 17-2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-14.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 470 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |