IL HB3241 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Lakesia Collins
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Lakesia Collins
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Illinois Sentencing Policy Advisory Council shall study and identify discriminatory practices in sentencing across the State and make recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly regarding ways to remedy those discriminatory practices. Effective immediately.
Title
DISCRIMINATORY SENTENCING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |