IL HB3232 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the University of Illinois Act. Provides that not less than 90 days prior to accepting applications for any undergraduate program for an academic year, the University of Illinois shall publish the standards for admission to that undergraduate program. Provides that no student shall be admitted to an undergraduate program who does not meet the published standards for admission to that undergraduate program. Provides that once the standards are published, the standards for admission to an undergraduate program shall not be changed during that academic year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U OF I-ADMISSIONS STANDARDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Higher Education Analysis Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback