IL HB3201 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the State Finance Act. Provides for a sales tax holiday on school supplies during the first 7 days of August of each calendar year. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-SCHOOL SUPPLIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3201&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3201.htm |