IL HB3178 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act, the Local Mass Transit District Act, and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the construction or acquisition of services or public transportation facilities by each Authority costing over $50,000 (now $10,000) are subject to certain public notice and public bidding requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
RTA-MTA-LMTDA-BID THRESHOLD
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 018-000-000 |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mass Transit Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3605 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3610 | 5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |