IL HB3172 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language requiring the payment of certain fees, in addition to the to the applicable registration fee, for U.S. Marine Corps, Paratrooper, Korean Service, Iraq Campaign, Afghanistan Campaign, U.S. Navy, Distinguished Flying Cross, Operation Iraqi Freedom, and Women Veteran special license plates. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
VEH CD-MILITARY PLATES-NO FEE
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] |
Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. John Jones [R] | Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0306 |
2011-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-04-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-001-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-667 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-668 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-669 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-676 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-677 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-686 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-688 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-693 | Amended Code | Citation Text |