IL HB3161 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-14)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to create and maintain a website to educate the public on heroin and prescription opioid abuse. Provides that at a minimum, the website shall include: (i) information on the warning signs of heroin and prescription opioid addiction; (ii) helpful hints for parents on how to discuss the dangers of heroin and prescription opioid addiction with their children; (iii) information on available treatment options and services; (iv) a listing of the toll-free number established by the Department to provide information and referral services for persons with questions concerning substance abuse and treatment; and (v) links to flyers and resources for download. Provides that the Department shall adopt any rules necessary to implement the new provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-OPIOID ABUSE-WEBSITE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030120-30New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback