IL HB3138 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Supreme Court Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers of the Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURTS-SECURITY OFFICERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
2021-08-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021
2021-08-26SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-08-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-06-15SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2021-05-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000
2021-05-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
2021-05-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-23HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
705511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback