IL HB3128 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the PFAS Reduction Act. Provides that the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall establish a take-back program for local fire departments and fire protection districts that use and store firefighting foam containing PFAS. Provides that fire departments and fire protection districts that participated in the most recent PFAS survey shall be eligible to participate in the program, but participation in the program shall not be required. Provides that the program shall provide funding and resources to ensure the proper destruction of firefighting foam containing PFAS. Provides that the program shall commence within 6 months after the effective date and continue for a period of 5 years or until the Office of the State Fire Marshall finds that no firefighting foam containing PFAS is reported in the PFAS survey. Effective immediately.
Title
PFAS DISPOSAL PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3128&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3128.htm |