IL HB3121 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that, to ensure that foster parents who foster children with diabetes have the knowledge and tools they need to provide and advocate for their foster children's proper care, the Department of Children and Family Services shall provide eligible foster parents with training on diabetes care, including training on insulin pump therapy, general diabetes management, carbohydrate counting, how to administer insulin with an insulin pen or syringe, and how to identify the warning signs of low blood sugar and diabetic ketoacidosis. Grants the Department rulemaking authority.
Title
DCFS-DIABETES CARE TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3121&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3121.htm |