IL HB3108 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. In Sections concerning the fire truck revolving loan program, the fire station revolving loan program, and the ambulance revolving loan program, provides that repayments of loans made under those programs (and interest on those moneys) may be retained by the Authority and used for the purposes for which they are otherwise authorized to be used (currently, deposited into the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, the Fire Station Revolving Loan Fund, and the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund, as applicable). Provides that a loan for the purchase of an ambulance may not exceed $200,000 (instead of $100,000).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IFA-FIRE TRUCKS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-010-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-23HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
203501825-80Amended CodeCitation Text
203501825-81Amended CodeCitation Text
203501825-85Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback