IL HB3106 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Supreme Court Act. Provides that marshals of the Supreme Court are peace officers and have all the powers possessed by police officers in cities and by sheriffs. Provides that marshals may exercise these powers throughout the State. Provides that no marshal has peace officer status or may exercise police powers unless: (i) he or she successfully completes the basic police training course mandated and approved by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board; or (ii) the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board waives the training requirement by reason of the marshal's prior law enforcement experience or training or both. Effective immediately.
Title
SUPREME COURT MARSHAL-POWERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0151 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |