IL HB3097 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cigarette Machine Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, the Cigarette Use Tax Act, the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995, the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Live Adult Entertainment Facility Surcharge Act, the Illinois Hydraulic Fracturing Tax Act, the Gas Revenue Tax Act, the Public Utilities Revenue Act, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, the Electricity Excise tax Act, the Bingo License and Tax Act, the Illinois Pull Tabs and Jar Games Act, the Charitable Games Act, the Liquor Control Act of 1934, the Environmental Protection Act, the Environmental Impact Fee Law, and the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that, if a payment provided for under one of those Acts exceeds the taxpayer's liability under that Act, then the taxpayer may credit the excess payment against liability subsequently to be remitted to the Department of Revenue. Amends the Renewable Energy, Energy Efficiency, and Coal Resources Development Law of 1997 and the Energy Assistance Act to incorporate certain provisions of the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 687 | 6-8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 20 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 128 | 1-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 175 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 450 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 450 | 2-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 615 | 2a.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 620 | 2a.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 640 | 2-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 640 | 2-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 125 | 315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 135 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 55.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |