IL HB3090 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Brand Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall make available in electronic format all recorded brands (rather than the Department shall publish all recorded brands in book form and shall publish supplemental lists at least once a year). Deletes language providing the Department shall, without charge, furnish one copy of the brand book supplements to the County Clerk and Sheriff of each county and that the general public may obtain copies by remitting to the Department the cost of printing and mailing each book and accompanying supplements. Repeals a provision providing that any slaughtering establishment or livestock market receiving branded livestock shall keep such records as required by the Department for a period of at least a year. Repeals a provision providing the Department, in cooperation with law enforcement officials, shall develop a uniform procedure whereby law enforcement officials shall alert livestock markets and livestock slaughtering establishments of reported livestock thefts. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BRAND ACT-ELECTRONIC FORMAT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0114
2017-08-15HouseEffective Date August 15, 2017
2017-08-15HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5104010Amended CodeCitation Text
5104012Repealed CodeCitation Text
5104013Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback