IL HB3070 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that a public institution of higher education may contract with any qualified source of supply, but shall use or consider, as applicable, specified special sources from which procurements may be made without competition. Provides requirements concerning public institution of higher education vendor lists. Provides for prequalification of potential public institution of higher education vendors. Provides that before making an award or approving a contract, the State purchasing officer must be satisfied that a prospective public institution of higher education vendor is responsible. Provides further requirements concerning vendor responsibility.
Title
PROCUREMENT-HIGHER ED VENDORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 20-170 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 20-175 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 20-180 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 20-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3070&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3070.htm |