IL HB3061 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Allows a person to petition the court and the court to order the sealing of: (1) Class 2 felony conviction records for burglary, delivery of a controlled substance, and possession of a stolen motor vehicle; (2) Class 3 felony conviction records for theft, retail theft, deceptive practices, and forgery; and (3) Class 4 felony conviction records for possession of cannabis, possession of a controlled substance, violation of the Methamphetamine Precursor Control Act, violation of the Steroid Control Act, prostitution, theft, retail theft, deceptive practices, forgery, and possession of burglary tools (rather than only Class 4 felony convictions for possession of cannabis, possession of a controlled substance, Methamphetamine Precursor Control Act, Steroid Control Act, and prostitution). The sealing is allowed 4 years after termination of the person's last sentence. Requires a person petitioning to seal a drug offense to pass a drug test within the 30 days preceding the filing of the petition to seal.
Title
CRIM ID SEALING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0142 |
2013-08-02 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-013-000 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-035-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-07 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |