IL HB3046 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, by January 1, 2024, the Environmental Protection Agency shall propose and, within one year after receipt of the Agency's proposal, the Board shall adopt (1) amendments to the Board's primary drinking water standards that will repeal the prohibition on the use of recycled sewage treatment plant effluent set forth in subsection (c) of 35 Ill. Adm. Code 611.231 and that will make any other revisions to those rules that are necessary to facilitate water reuse in the State and (2) rules establishing programs for both direct potable and nonpotable reuse of treated wastewater, including rules establishing permitting standards and a permit application process. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-EFFLUENT REUSE RULES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2023-03-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2023-03-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
2023-03-23SenateArrive in Senate
2023-03-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-040-000
2023-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
2023-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-010-000
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415514.8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback