IL HB3033 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may assess specified consultation fees up to $500 (rather than assess a $500 fee). Deletes language providing that the Department shall not assess any fee for consultations requested by a State agency or federal agency.
Title
DNR-CONSULTATION FEES
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0491 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-06-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-25 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-001-000 |
2017-06-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 805 | 805-555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |