IL HB3029 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall immediately upon release of an inmate earlier than it otherwise would because of a grant of sentence credit for good conduct email the police department of the municipality into which the inmate is released that the inmate has been released into that municipality, or if the inmate is released into an unincorporated area or an area that does not have a police department, the Department shall email the county sheriff of the county in which the unincorporated area or municipality without a police department is located that the inmate has been released into an unincorporated area or an area that does not have a police department that is located in that county.
Title
CD CORR-EARLY RELEASE-EMAIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0267 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |