IL HB3028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Adds provisions concerning expanded use of energy saving programs. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may establish a program for promoting expanded use of energy saving programs for residential and small commercial customers. Provides that the program shall include the use of thermostats, lights, plugs, and other devices that allow a customer to control and reduce his or her energy usage. Provides that the program shall not discriminate based on brand names and shall include ways to promote those energy-saving devices and incentives for residential customers, including both homeowners and renters. Provides that on or before September 1, 2020 and every 2 years thereafter, the Commission shall initiate a collaborative workshop for stakeholders, retail electric suppliers, advocates for energy savings, and industry representatives developing energy saving devices and applications, and that any recommendations arising from the workshop process shall be included in the annual report of the Office of Retail Market Development.
Title
EXPAND ENERGY SAVING PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |