IL HB3020 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces fees payable to the Secretary of State and the Illinois Supreme Court by 50%. Applies to registration fees, copy fees, expedited service fees, and attorney certificate of registration fees.
Title
LLC FEES 50% REDUCTION
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 45-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3020&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3020.htm |