IL HB3010 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0410
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that the definition of "disability" also includes any mental, psychological, or developmental disability, including autism spectrum disorders.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-DISABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0410 |
2011-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 31, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |