IL HB2997 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Connected Multimodal Mobility Act. Defines terms. Provides that beginning on or before January 1, 2027, every motor vehicle operating upon any highway in this State shall be equipped with automatic notification technology. Provides that beginning on or before January 1, 2027, the Department of Transportation shall install a traffic-control device network on each traffic-control device operating in this State. Provides that each traffic-control device network shall communicate to a vehicle installed with automatic notification technology when vehicle or pedestrian traffic requires the driver of the vehicle to change the vehicle's speed. Provides that the Department and the Secretary of State shall adopt rules to implement the Act.
Title
MULTIMODAL MOBILITY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | To Future Roads: Growth & Improvement Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2997&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2997.htm |