IL HB2996 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Removes procurement expenditures made by the University of Illinois from the application of the Act and the University of Illinois from the definition of "State agency". Amends the State Property Control Act to remove property of the University of Illinois from the definition of "property" (but still requires the University of Illinois to send usable, surplus equipment to the Department of Central Management Services for transfer or disposal). Amends the University of Illinois Act. Under a University of Illinois Investment, Performance, and Accountability Commitment, requires the State to annually appropriate a minimum specified amount, provided that the University meets certain requirements at its campuses. Provides for an annual report, and repeals the Commitment on June 30, 2022. Provides for the issuance of certificates of participation for capital improvements, to be reviewed by the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. Requires the maximum annual debt service for the University's total certificate of participation obligation to not exceed $100,000,000. Subject to appropriation, provides for an Illinois Excellence Program to recruit and retain promising faculty throughout the University of Illinois system through capital investment in both new and distressed facilities; amends the State Finance Act to create a special fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIVERSITY OF IL COMMITMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
110305105New CodeSee Bill Text
110305110New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
305001-10Amended CodeCitation Text
305001-15.100Amended CodeCitation Text
306051.02Amended CodeCitation Text
306057.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback