IL HB2993 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Act and the School Code. Provides that school districts may serve students produce grown and harvested by students in school-owned or community gardens if the produce meets requirements adopted by rule by the Department of Public Health. Requires the requirements to include, but not be limited to, testing soil and water used in the growing of the produce for contaminants. Makes similar changes to the Article concerning the Chicago school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCHOOL-GROWN PRODUCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0505
2017-09-15HouseEffective Date June 1, 2018
2017-09-15HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire
2017-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text
2023058.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback