IL HB2987 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that State agencies, when hiring for internships and student assistant positions, shall give preference to a qualified applicant who is, or has been, a dependent child in foster care, a homeless youth, or a formerly incarcerated youth. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONNEL-INTERNSHIPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0141
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-047-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-003-001
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
204158b.21New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback