IL HB2973 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who (i) has an associate's degree, a bachelor's degree, or a graduate degree from an institution of higher education accredited by the U.S. Department of Education, (ii) has annual student loan repayment expenses, and (iii) is employed full-time in the State, or has an offer of full-time employment in the State, in one or more of the specified science and technology fields is eligible for an income tax credit equal to the taxpayer's student loan repayment expenses for the taxable year, but not to exceed a maximum credit limit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-STUDENT LOAN
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |