IL HB2971 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning unauthorized video recording and live video transmission. Provides that a person also commits the offense when he or she knowingly makes a video record or transmits live video of another person in a residential dwelling (rather than that other person's residence) without that person's consent. Provides that if the defendant at the time of the commission of the offense was 18 years of age or over, the penalty is one class higher than if the offense was committed by a person under 18 years of age.
Title
CRIM CD-VIDEOTAPING RESIDENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 013-001-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 26-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |