IL HB2953 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that when a separate finding of fact by the trier of fact shows beyond a reasonable doubt that an offender is a public official who has been convicted of a felony and that the felony conviction relates to, arises out of, or is in connection with the offender's holding of an elected office, the offender may be sentenced to pay a fine not to exceed the greater of the value of the salary and fringe benefits paid to the offender, by virtue of holding an elected public office, after the commission of the first act that was a basis for the felony conviction or $25,000.
Title
CD CORR-FELONY FINES-OFFICIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |