IL HB2940 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Provides that subject to appropriation (currently, not subject to appropriation), the Illinois Emergency Management Agency shall study specified items in the formulation of State nuclear power policy. Repeals the Illinois Construction Evaluation Act. Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Repeals Sections concerning the Custodial Interview Pilot Program and grants for electronic recording equipment. Amends the School Code. Repeals a Section concerning full year feasibility study, grants, and transitional expenditure reimbursements. Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Repeals a Section concerning the graduation incentive grant program. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVERNMENT-AGENCY MANDATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0149 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-21.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
110 | 205 | 9.28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3015 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3310 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3930 | 7.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3930 | 7.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 30-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 33-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |