IL HB2940 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Provides that a health care professional who, acting in good faith, directly or by standing order, prescribes or dispenses an opioid antidote to a patient who, in the judgment of the health care professional, is capable of administering the drug in an emergency, shall not, as a result of his or her acts or omissions, "be liable for civil damages when administering naloxone in an emergency situation". Amends the Good Samaritan Act. Provides that any law enforcement officer or fireman, any emergency medical technician (EMT), and any first responder who in good faith provides emergency care to any person (rather than provides emergency care without fee or compensation) shall not, as a result of his or her acts or omissions, "be liable for civil damages when administering naloxone in an emergency situation".
Title
NALOXONE-LIABILITY EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Substance Abuse Special |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 301 | 5-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 49 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |