IL HB2918 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that an additional tax shall be imposed at the rate of 1% of 94% of the gross rental receipts from the renting, leasing, or letting of hotel rooms. Provides that the proceeds from the additional tax shall be deposited into the Illinois Experience Fund. Provides that moneys in the Illinois Experience Fund shall be used to create, enhance, and promote artistic and cultural events and expositions in the State. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
HOTEL TAX-ARTS AND CULTURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 145 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |